Jackson v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Damien Jackson
Defendant: f/n/u Smith, M. Holloway and B. Edwards
Case Number: 3:2019cv01133
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #7 Order Dismissing Case. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (am)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Assessing Filing Fee $350 for Damien Jackson. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A. Any appeal of this order would not be in good faith as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). This is the final order denying all relief in this matter. The Clerk SHALL enter judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(b). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/4/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (Warden at Lois Deberry Special Needs sent a copy of the order by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Damien Jackson. (am)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail the plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of Administrative Order 93. If the plaintiff seeks to have this court consider his complaint, he MUST either pay the $400.00 filing fee in full or complete the application to proceed in forma pauperis and return the properly completed application and trust account statement to the district court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/13/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (Pro se party sent blank IFP (short) form and a copy of Admin Order 93 by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Letter regarding pleading forms from Damien Jackson. (am)
December 17, 2019 (Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Damien Jackson. (afs) Modified on 12/17/2019 (afs).
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B. Edwards, M. Holloway, f/n/u Smith, filed by Damien Jackson. (afs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2019: #1 Exhibit A. Grievance 1, #2 Exhibit B Grievance 2, #3 Exhibit C Grievance 3, #4 Exhibit D Grievance 4, #5 Exhibit E Grievance 5, #6 Exhibit F Grievance 6, #7 Exhibit G Grievance 7, #8 Exhibit H Grievance 8, #9 Exhibit I Grievance 9) (afs). Modified on 12/17/2019 (afs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?