Luxottica Group S.p.A. et al v. M&D Market Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A. and Oakley, Inc.
Defendant: M&D Market Corp. and Mayank Patel
Case Number: 3:2019cv01145
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/17/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. The Initial Case Management Conference set for February 18, 2020 is CANCELLED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby rescheduled for March 17, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 2/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 4, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Sonya S. Wright. (dt)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Response to Complaint by M&D Market Corp., Mayank Patel. (Wright, Sonya)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sonya S. Wright on behalf of All Defendants (Wright, Sonya)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. Election of Statutory Damages (VanAusdall, Jacob)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Oakley, Inc., Luxottica Group S.p.A.. M&D Market Corp. served on 1/12/2020. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/29/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to M&D Market Corp. and Mayank Patel. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
December 23, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jacob C. VanAusdall and Todd G. Cole. (dt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oakley, Inc.. (dt)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A.. (dt)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M&D Market Corp. and Mayank Patel (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3054216), filed by Oakley, Inc. and Luxottica Group S.p.A. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 12/23/2019 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luxottica Group S.p.A. et al v. M&D Market Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&D Market Corp.
Represented By: Sonya S. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayank Patel
Represented By: Sonya S. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Represented By: Todd G. Cole
Represented By: Jacob C. VanAusdall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Represented By: Todd G. Cole
Represented By: Jacob C. VanAusdall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?