Fitzgerald v. Prime Health Services Inc.
Plaintiff: Amy Marlene Fitzgerald
Defendant: Prime Helath Services Inc. and Prime Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01169
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 12 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Prime Health Services, Inc.. (Myers, Margaret)
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Prime Health Services, Inc..(Myers, Margaret)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret R.T. Myers on behalf of Prime Health Services, Inc. (Myers, Margaret)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua C. Cumby on behalf of Prime Health Services, Inc. (Cumby, Joshua)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #3 Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement, #5 Notice of Case Management Conference, #6 Order, #4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge Green Card was signed 1/13/2020 for all Acknowledgement filed by Amy Marlene Fitzgerald. (Barnes, William)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #2 Summons Issued Green Card Signed 1/2/2020 Acknowledgement filed by Amy Marlene Fitzgerald. (Barnes, William)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/6/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
January 2, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for William C. Barnes. (mg)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Prime Health Services Inc. Service copies given to counsel at Intake. (mg) Modified on 1/7/2020 (mg).
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prime Health Services Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 34675057386), filed by Amy Marlene Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Receipt)(mg) Modified on 1/7/2020 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald v. Prime Health Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Marlene Fitzgerald
Represented By: William C. Barnes
Represented By: William Clark Barnes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Helath Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua C. Cumby
Represented By: Margaret R.T. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?