United States of America v. 3435 West MacArthur Blvd., Santa Ana, California et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Proceeds of any Rent, Sale, or Liquidation thereof and 3435 West MacArthur Blvd., Santa Ana, California
Claimant: Natalia Georgescu and Tache Gabriel Georgescu
Case Number: 3:2020cv00014
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Elizabeth Stepp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 3/3/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
March 2, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Elizabeth K. Stepp from the United States District Court for the Northern of Texas filed by Natalia Georgescu and Tache Gabriel Georgescu. (dt)
March 2, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED MOTION for attorney Elizabeth Stepp to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalia Georgescu and Tache Gabriel Georgescu. (dt)
February 27, 2020 Filing 15 RECEIPT #34675058047 in the amount of $100 re #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (vh)
February 26, 2020 TX State Bar status verified as active for Elizabeth K. Stepp. (dt)
February 26, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Elizabeth K. Stepp: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 3/18/2020. (dt)
February 26, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#13 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (dt)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Elizabeth K. Stepp from the United States District Court for the Northern of Texas filed by Natalia Georgescu and Tache Gabriel Georgescu. (dt)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Elizabeth K. Stepp to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid) by Natalia Georgescu and Tache Gabriel Georgescu. (dt)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 WRIT OF ENTRY Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Writ of Entry. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/15/2020. (dt) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/30/2020) (dt).
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 APPLICATION for Protective Order to Secure, Maintain and Preserve the Availability of the Defendant Real Properties for Forfeiture. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: In consideration of the United States' Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal, the Court finds that good cause is shown that filing the Affidavit of Richard Haines under seal is appropriate and that the requested relief should be GRANTED. The Clerk shall place the Affidavit of Richard Haines filed in support of the Verified Complaint In Rem under seal and that it shall remain under seal pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/15/20. (dt)
January 9, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Matthew Blackburn. (dt)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Writ of Entry by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Writ of Entry)(dt)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in support of #4 APPLICATION for Protective Order to Secure, Maintain and Preserve the Availability of the Defendant Real Properties for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (dt)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Protective Order to Secure, Maintain and Preserve the Availability of the Defendant Real Properties for Forfeiture by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Order)(dt)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 filed by United States of America. (dt)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by United States of America. (dt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2020: #1 Attachment - Proposed Order) (dt).
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against 3435 West MacArthur Blvd., Santa Ana, California and The Proceeds of any Rent, Sale, or Liquidation thereof, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 1/8/2020 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 3435 West MacArthur Blvd., Santa Ana, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Proceeds of any Rent, Sale, or Liquidation thereof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3435 West MacArthur Blvd., Santa Ana, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Matthew Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Natalia Georgescu
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tache Gabriel Georgescu
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?