Ingram et al v. Neutron Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ingram and Kelcie Ingram
Defendant: Neutron Holdings, Inc. and Lime
Case Number: 3:2020cv00037
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The #8 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference is GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is RESET for 4/16/2020 at 2:45 PM. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/9/2020. (ds)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Neutron Holdings, Inc.. (McLeod, Robert)
January 23, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert R. McLeod. (mg)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Neutron Holdings, Inc.. (McLeod, Robert)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Neutron Holdings, Inc..(McLeod, Robert)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. McLeod on behalf of Neutron Holdings, Inc. (McLeod, Robert)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 2:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
January 13, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rocky McElhaney, Alisha M. Toll, and Travis B. Swearingen. (mg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Neutron Holdings, Inc. from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 19C2862. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3064317) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Kevin Bajurin, #3 Exhibit 3 - 9-20-19 Settlement Demand, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram et al v. Neutron Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neutron Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Travis B. Swearingen
Represented By: Robert R. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lime
Represented By: Travis B. Swearingen
Represented By: Robert R. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ingram
Represented By: Rocky McElhaney
Represented By: Alisha M. Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelcie Ingram
Represented By: Rocky McElhaney
Represented By: Alisha M. Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?