Thomas v. Atlas Van Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kaci Thomas
Defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc. and Ace Relocation Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00039
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:14706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Kaci Thomas. (Lewis, C.)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. #14 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for March 9, 2020 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/5/2020. (vh)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint Proposed Initial Case Management Order filed by Ace Relocation Services, Inc., Atlas Van Lines, Inc. (Rhoades, Alexandria)
February 21, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Ace Relocation Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Law ISO MTD)(Rhoades, Alexandria)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ace Relocation Services, Inc. (Rhoades, Alexandria)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant Atlas Van Lines, Inc.'s ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Atlas Van Lines, Inc. (Rhoades, Alexandria)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have up to and including February 24, 2020 to respond to the Amended Complaint filed against them by Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/6/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Ace Relocation Services, Inc., Atlas Van Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline)(Rhoades, Alexandria)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The timely filing of an Amended Complaint ( #9 ) renders moot the pending Motion to Dismiss ( #6 ). It is therefore ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/28/2020. (gb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ace Relocation Services, Inc., Atlas Van Lines, Inc., filed by Kaci Thomas.(Lewis, C.)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kaci Thomas. (Lewis, C.)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ace Relocation Services, Inc., Atlas Van Lines, Inc. (Rhoades, Alexandria)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ace Relocation Services, Inc., Atlas Van Lines, Inc. (Rhoades, Alexandria)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 02:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (gb)
January 13, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kenneth M. Bryant, Alexandria A. Rhoades and C. Benjamin Lewis. (gb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ace Relocation Services, Inc. (gb)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atlas Van Lines, Inc. (gb)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ace Relocation Services, Inc., Atlas Van Lines, Inc. from Chancery Court for Rutherford County, case number 19CV-1764. (Filing fee paid $400 receipt number 0650-3064350) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Claim Demand Form, #3 Attachment Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Atlas Van Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Bryant
Represented By: Alexandria A. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Relocation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Bryant
Represented By: Alexandria A. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaci Thomas
Represented By: C. Benjamin Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?