Halliburton v. Reynolds
Plaintiff: Conese Halliburton
Defendant: Michael John Reynolds
Case Number: 3:2020cv00044
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court has received notice that Defendant Reynolds has filed a voluntary petition under Chapter 13 of the U.S. Bankruptcy Code in the Southern District of New York. (Doc. No. #8 ). Accordingly, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a), this case is automatically stayed, pending further order of the Court. The Clerk is directed to close the case administratively, subject to being reopened upon a motion by either party. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/12/2020. (dt)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Elizabeth A. Hass, Attorney for Michael J. Reynolds, re: a voluntary petition under Chapter 13 of the United States Bankruptcy Code in the Soutern District of New York was filed on behalf of Michael J. Reynolds. (dt)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/7/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Defendant's Bankruptcy Filing by Conese Halliburton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter from Defendant's Bankruptcy Counsel, #2 Attachment Notice of Defendant's Bankruptcy Case Filing, #3 Attachment Michael Reynolds Bankruptcy Petition)(Horwitz, Daniel) Modified on 2/6/2020 (dt).
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Conese Halliburton. Michael John Reynolds served on 1/16/2020. (Horwitz, Daniel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Michael John Reynolds. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (dt)
January 16, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel A. Horwitz. (dt)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael John Reynolds (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3066724), filed by Conese Halliburton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reynolds Sentencing Hearing Transcript, Case No. 2019-I-384,, #2 Exhibit 2 - Reynolds Plea Transcript, Case No. 2019-I-384, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halliburton v. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conese Halliburton
Represented By: Daniel A. Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael John Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?