Harris Research, Inc. v. Kramer et al
Plaintiff: Harris Research, Inc.
Defendant: Daniel Kramer
Case Number: 3:2020cv00054
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/16/2020 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from March 9, 2020, to 3:30 p.m., Thursday, April 16, 2020, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/5/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Harris Research, Inc.. (Thorsen, Christopher)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #11 ) to which there is no opposition. The motion is GRANTED, and the preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for February 20, 2020, is CONTINUED to Friday, April 3, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/18/2020. (dt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing Scheduled for February 20, 2020 by Harris Research, Inc.. (Thorsen, Christopher)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Harris Research, Inc.. Daniel Kramer served on 1/24/2020. (Thorsen, Christopher)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff Harris Research Inc.'s Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order under Rule 65(b) (Doc. No. #5 ) is DENIED. The Court will hold a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction on Thursday, February 20, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Absent extraordinary circumstances, the hearing will conclude on that day. No witness shall testify live at the preliminary injunction hearing unless the party calling such witness to testify has identified and made that witness available for a deposition prior to the hearing. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Harris Research, Inc. . (Thorsen, Christopher)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Harris Research, Inc.. (Thorsen, Christopher) Modified on 2/4/2020 (mg).
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Daniel Kramer. (Service copies will be picked up by counsel.) (dt)
January 23, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christopher E. Thorsen. (dt)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Kramer (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3071193), filed by Harris Research, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Franchise Agreement 243165, #2 Exhibit 2A - Franchise Agreement 243016, #3 Exhibit 2B - Franchise Agreement 243044, #4 Exhibit 2C - Franchise Agreement 236122, #5 Exhibit 2D - Franchise Agreement 243004, #6 Exhibit 2E - Franchise Agreement 243188, #7 Exhibit 2F - Franchise Agreement 243216, #8 Exhibit 2G - Franchise Agreement 236346, #9 Exhibit 2H - Franchise Agreement 436113, #10 Exhibit 3 - Trademark Registrations, #11 Exhibit 4 - August 27 2019 Letter, #12 Exhibit 5 - Oct 10 2019 Email, #13 Exhibit 6 - Oct 28 2019 Termination Letter, #14 Exhibit 7 - Chem-Dry Shop Evaluation, #15 Exhibit 8 - Website Screenshot, #16 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 1/23/2020 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris Research, Inc. v. Kramer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris Research, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher E. Thorsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?