Schuster v. Lee Company
Plaintiff: Paul A. Schuster
Defendant: Lee Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00064
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 5/8/2020. Discovery due by 11/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2021. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/16/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/20/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 20, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Dohner Smith. (dt)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER finding as moot #8 motion to dismiss. On March 19, 2020, Defendant filed a notice of withdrawal #14 of its motion to dismiss with reservation of the right to later file a motion to dismiss. The pending motion to dismiss is therefore moot. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 03/20/2020. (BH)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lee Company.(Smith, Mary)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Lee Company of its #8 MOTION to Dismiss and #9 Memorandum in Support. (Smith, Mary) Modified on 3/20/2020 (dt).
March 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/10/2020; ORDER to enter. (Tape #digital recording.) (Hearing lasted :41)(jwc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lee Company. (Smith, Mary)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paul A. Schuster. (Collins, Heather)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Lee Company. (Smith, Mary)
February 18, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Stephanie A. Chavez. (dt)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 CONFORMED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Lee Company re #9 Memorandum in Support filed by Lee Company, #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lee Company. (Smith, Mary) Modified on 2/19/2020 (dt).
February 18, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 and #9 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt)
February 18, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Dohner Smith. (dt)
February 17, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss , #1 Complaint filed by Lee Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge)(Smith, Mary)
February 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Lee Company. (Smith, Mary)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Paul A. Schuster. Lee Company served on 1/30/2020. (Hunter, Anne)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/30/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Lee Company. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
January 29, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins, Anne Hunter and Ashley S. Walter. (dt)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee Company (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3072177), filed by Paul A. Schuster. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuster v. Lee Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Schuster
Represented By: Heather M. Collins
Represented By: Anne Hunter
Represented By: Ashley S. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?