Black v. SP Plus Corporation
Plaintiff: Hannah Black
Defendant: SP Plus Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00105
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for William S. Rutchow and Benjamin P. Lemly. (dt)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SP Plus Corporation.(Rutchow, William)
February 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Hannah Black. SP Plus Corporation served on 2/14/2020. (Hunter, Anne)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/7/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to SP Plus Corporation. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
February 6, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins and Anne Hunter. (dt)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SP Plus Corporation (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3081256), filed by Hannah Black. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. SP Plus Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Black
Represented By: Heather M. Collins
Represented By: Anne Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SP Plus Corporation
Represented By: William S. Rutchow
Represented By: Benjamin P. Lemly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?