RBD Technologies LLC v. Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RBD Technologies LLC
Defendant: Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc. and Barrett Firearms USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00108
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #13 Order Dismissing Case. (vh)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. No. #12 .) Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. This Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/10/2020. (vh)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RBD Technologies LLC (Reynolds, Gregory)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Steven G. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 2/24/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Steven G. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3087748) by RBD Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Reynolds, Gregory)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/11/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by RBD Technologies LLC. Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc. served on 2/11/2020. (Clark, John)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by RBD Technologies LLC. Barrett Firearms USA, Inc. served on 2/11/2020. (Clark, John)
February 7, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Steven G. Hill: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 2/28/2020. (gb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc., Barrett Firearms USA, Inc. (gb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb)
February 7, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory S. Reynolds and John David Clark. GA State Bar status verified as active for Steven G. Hill. (gb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by RBD Technologies LLC. (gb)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc., Barrett Firearms USA, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-3082188), filed by RBD Technologies LLC. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: US Patent 351, #2 Exhibit B: US Patent 609, #3 Exhibit C: US Patent 175, #4 Exhibit D: Manual, #5 Exhibit E: Model, #6 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RBD Technologies LLC v. Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RBD Technologies LLC
Represented By: Gregory S. Reynolds
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: John David Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Firearms USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?