Taylor v. Board of Parole
Plaintiff: Reggie Taylor
Defendant: Board of Parole and Tennessee Dpt. of Corr.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00123
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Pro se party called to update his address. Pro se party sent a copy of DE: #4 by regular mail to new address. (am)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The fee for filing this action is $400.00. See 28 U.S.C. 1914(a) (establishing civil filing fee of $350.00) and attached Miscellaneous Fee Schedule (establishing additional $50.00 administrative fee for filing action in district court). If Plaintiff is unable to afford the filing fee, he may seek leave to proceed IFP. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a blank application for leave to proceed IFP (long form, for non-prisoners). Within 28 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff SHALL either remit the full filing fee or complete and return the IFP application to the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff's submission must include the case number assigned to this action, No. 3:20-cv-00123. Plaintiff is cautioned that, should he fail to comply with this Order within the time specified, this action may be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/4/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (Pro se party sent blank IFP (long) form by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) Modified Text on 3/4/2020 (am).
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Reggie Taylor. (Address updated per Notice.) (am)
February 19, 2020 (Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Parole, Tennessee Dpt. of Corr., filed by Reggie Taylor.(afs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Board of Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Dpt. of Corr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?