Chadwick v. Evicore Healthcare MSI, LLC
Plaintiff: Melanie Chadwick
Defendant: Evicore Healthcare MSI, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00212
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Lauren F. Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Evicore Healthcare MSI, LLC. (Hughes, David)
May 8, 2020 GA State Bar status verified as active for Lauren F. Gordon. (am)
May 8, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#11 : By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (am)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions to Amend due by 7/31/2020. Discovery due by 2/18/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2021. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 12/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 5/7/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Lauren F. Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3136530) by Evicore Healthcare MSI, LLC. (Hughes, David)
April 29, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 4/29/2020; ORDER to enter. (Tape #not recorded.) (Hearing lasted :34)(jwc)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Case Management Conference by Telephone reset for 4/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/23/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint filed by Melanie Chadwick. (Hunter, Anne)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melanie Chadwick. Evicore Healthcare MSI, LLC waiver sent on 3/19/2020. (Hunter, Anne)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
March 24, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for David Andrew Hughes. (am)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew Hughes on behalf of Evicore Healthcare MSI, LLC (Hughes, David)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Evicore Healthcare MSI, LLC. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
March 11, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins, Anne Hunter. (am)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evicore Healthcare MSI, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3104522), filed by Melanie Chadwick. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chadwick v. Evicore Healthcare MSI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evicore Healthcare MSI, LLC
Represented By: David Andrew Hughes
Represented By: Lauren F. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Chadwick
Represented By: Heather M. Collins
Represented By: Anne Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?