Cunningham v. Progress, Inc.
Plaintiff: Camille Cunningham
Defendant: Progress, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00215
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Camille Cunningham. Progress, Inc. served on 3/23/2020. (Hunter, Anne)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone reset for 4/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/23/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Joint filed by Camille Cunningham. (Collins, Heather)
April 13, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Nelson Suarez and Teresa Rider Bult. (dt)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Progress, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Nelson)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Progress, Inc..(Suarez, Nelson)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 4/27/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/10/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/12/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Progress, Inc. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 (DISREGARD - DUPLICATE ENTRY) NOTICE. (dt) Modified on 3/12/2020 (dt).
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
March 12, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins and Anne Hunter. (dt)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Progress, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3104604), filed by Camille Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Progress, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa Rider Bult
Represented By: Nelson Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Cunningham
Represented By: Heather M. Collins
Represented By: Anne Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?