United States of America v. Content of US Bank *9335
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Content of US Bank *9335
Case Number: 3:2020cv00216
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Upon motion #2 of the United States, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall place the Affidavit of Carla Rexing filed in support of the Verified Complaint In Rem under seal and remain under seal pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/13/2020. (mg)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Summons and Warrant for Arrest in Rem on Defendant Content of US Bank *9335 issued by the Clerk.(mg)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 Application for Summons and Warrant In Rem by United States of America. (mg) Modified on 3/12/2020 (mg).
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Order)(mg)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against Content of US Bank 9335, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Content of US Bank *9335
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Content of US Bank *9335
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Matthew Blackburn
Represented By: Debra Teufel Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?