Larry E. Parrish, P.C. v. Bennett et al
Plaintiff: Larry E. Parrish, P.C.
Defendant: Andy D. Bennett, Frank C. Clement, W. Neal McBrayer and Frank G. Clement
Case Number: 3:2020cv00275
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
2 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
3 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Larry E. Parrish, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Page Reference Addendum, #2 Attachment 1-Page Reference Addendum, #3 Attachment 1-Page Reference Addendum)(Parrish, Larry)
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Larry E. Parrish, P.C.. (Parrish, Larry)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Defendants filed a motion to dismiss and a motion to stay discovery pending resolution of the motion to dismiss. [11, 13]. Plaintiff's Response to the motion to dismiss is due 6/5/2020; Defendants' Reply is due 6/19/2020. #11 Plaintiff's Response to the motion to stay is due 5/21/2020; Defendants' Reply is due 5/26/2020. #13 Discovery is stayed pending the decision on the motion to stay discovery. These dates are final absent good cause shown. Status hearing set for September 22, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Marvin E. Aspen on 5/15/2020. (dt)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE CANCELLING INTITAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Please note that due to the recusal of Judge Holmes in this case on April 10, 2020, (Docket Entry No. #9 ) this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Frensley, and the May 18, 2020, initial case management conference is CANCELLED to be reset by Judge Frensley. (hb)
May 14, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Andy D. Bennett, Frank G. Clement, W. Neal McBrayer . (Miller, Laura)
May 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Andy D. Bennett, Frank G. Clement, W. Neal McBrayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Requests for Admission to Judge Bennett, #2 Exhibit Requests for Admission to Judge McBrayer, #3 Exhibit Requests for Admission to Judge Clement)(Miller, Laura)
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andy D. Bennett, Frank G. Clement, W. Neal McBrayer . (Miller, Laura)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Andy D. Bennett, Frank G. Clement, W. Neal McBrayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TN Court of Appeals Orders, #2 Exhibit Rule 11 Application, #3 Exhibit TN Supreme Court Orders)(Miller, Laura)
April 23, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Laura Elizabeth Miller. (dt)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Elizabeth Miller on behalf of Andy D. Bennett, Frank G. Clement, W. Neal McBrayer (Miller, Laura)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Larry E. Parrish, P.C..(Parrish, Larry)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself in this case and return the case to the Clerk for transfer to a visiting judge. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Marvin E. Aspen by the Clerk's Office for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/10/2020. (vh)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Larry E. Parrish, P.C.. (Parrish, Larry)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: I hereby recuse myself and this case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/6/2020. (Note: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Frensley.) (mg)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Andy D. Bennett, Frank C. Clement and W. Neal McBrayer. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
March 31, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Larry E. Parrish. (dt)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andy D. Bennett, Frank C. Clement and W. Neal McBrayer (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3114943), filed by Larry E. Parrish, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Response from case in Court of Appeals of Tennessee, No. M2017-02451-COA-RS-CV, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet) (No Summons provided with the complaint.) (dt) Modified on 3/31/2020 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry E. Parrish, P.C. v. Bennett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy D. Bennett
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank C. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Neal McBrayer
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank G. Clement
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E. Parrish, P.C.
Represented By: Larry E. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?