Conley v. John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Petitioner: John Conley
Respondent: John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00385
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Scales, William)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference will be reset by later order of the court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/30/2020. (vh)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Scales, William)
June 30, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (vh)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alvin Scott Derrick on behalf of John Wiley & Sons, Inc. (Derrick, Alvin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Scales, William)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint -- RESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO PETITION FOR CONTEMPT by John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Partial Final Award of 6/8/18, #3 Exhibit C - Final Award of 5/17/19, #4 Exhibit D - Order of Dec. 27, 2019)(Scales, William)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed 05/22/2020 Acknowledgement filed by John Conley. (McKellar, Andrea)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2020 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this case is transferred to United States District Judge Aleta A. Trauger as related to Case No. 3:19-cv-822. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/11/2020. (dt)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to John Wiley & Sons, Inc. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
May 6, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Andrea T. McKellar. (dt)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR CONTEMPT (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3135482), filed by John Conley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) Modified on 5/6/2020 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conley v. John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Alvin Scott Derrick
Represented By: William C. Scales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Conley
Represented By: Andrea T. McKellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?