Gottlieb et al v. Warner Music Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Gottlieb and Susan Joseph
Defendant: Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records and Warner Music Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00386
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Motion #15 GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESET for 8/31/2020 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/17/2020. (mg)
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Anthony Gottlieb, Susan Joseph. (Niro, William)
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Warner Music Group, filed by Anthony Gottlieb, Susan Joseph. (Niro, William)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Warner Music Group, filed by Anthony Gottlieb, Susan Joseph. (Niro, William)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Atlantice Recording Corporation, filed by Anthony Gottlieb, Susan Joseph. (Niro, William)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for Monday, June 22, 2020 is hereby RESET for Tuesday, June 23, 2020 at 1:45 p.m. and shall be held by telephone conference. Lead counsel for each party shall participate in the conference. Judge Trauger's Courtroom Deputy will email to counsel the number they should call in order to participate in the conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/27/2020. (mg)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for William L. Niro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 5/6/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthony Gottlieb. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Trustee Designation/Certificate of Service)(Dunham, Griffin)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD, DOCUMENT REFILED AT #9 *** BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anthony Gottlieb. (Dunham, Griffin) Modified on 5/6/2020 (mg).
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Susan Joseph. (Dunham, Griffin)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 1:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Music Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney William L. Niro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3135866) by Anthony Gottlieb, Susan Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Disciplinary Commission Letter)(Dunham, Griffin)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
May 5, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL William L. Niro: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 5/26/2020. (mg)
May 5, 2020 IL State Bar status verified as active for William L. Niro. (mg)
May 5, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Griffin S. Dunham. (mg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Music Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3135633), filed by Susan Joseph, Anthony Gottlieb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1976 Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - 1980 Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - 1980 Inducement Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - 1997 Redirection Letter, #5 Exhibit E - 2019 Correspondence, #6 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gottlieb et al v. Warner Music Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Recording Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gottlieb
Represented By: Griffin S. Dunham
Represented By: William L. Niro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Joseph
Represented By: Griffin S. Dunham
Represented By: William L. Niro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?