Sawyers v. Atlas Logistics Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Sawyers
Defendant: Atlas Logistics Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00393
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions to Amend due by 10/30/2020. Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2021. Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/1/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
June 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 6/22/2020. (Tape #not recorded.) (Hearing lasted :43)(jwc)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Filed on behalf of all parties filed by All Plaintiffs. (Meloff-Stilgenbauer, Andrea)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 6/3/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to First Amended Complaint by Atlas Logistics Inc.. (Rhoades, Alexandria)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Turner B. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 5/12/20. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT filed by Atlas Logistics Inc. re #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Rhoades, Alexandria)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/11/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 8, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#6 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (Davies, Kirk)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Turner B. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3137460) by Atlas Logistics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Rhoades, Alexandria)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atlas Logistics Inc.. (Rhoades, Alexandria)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (vh)
May 7, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Turner B. Williams: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 5/28/2020. (vh)
May 7, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kenneth M. Bryant, Alexandria A. Rhoades, and Andrea Stilgenbauer. AL State Bar status verified as active for Turner B. Williams. (vh) Modified on 5/7/2020 (vh).
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Atlas Logistics Inc. from Circuit Court for Davidson County, case number 20C639. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3136705) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Original Complaint and attempted service, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court filings served on Atlas Logistics Inc, #3 Exhibit 3-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyers v. Atlas Logistics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sawyers
Represented By: Andrea I. Stilgenbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Logistics Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Bryant
Represented By: Alexandria A. Rhoades
Represented By: Turner B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?