Hoffner et al v. Bird Rides, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tammy Hoffner and Richard Hoffner
Defendant: Bird Rides, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00394
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. The Parties shall file a status report with the Court by October 5, 2020 confirming the mediation occurred and whether it was successful. The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for July 23, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in cancelled to be reset at a later date if necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 5/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay by Bird Rides, Inc.. (Tragesser, Joel)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/11/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bird Rides, Inc.. (Tragesser, Joel)
May 7, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joel E. Tragesser and David J. Weissman. (dt)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bird Rides, Inc. from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 20C783. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3137287) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffner et al v. Bird Rides, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Hoffner
Represented By: David J. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hoffner
Represented By: David J. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Rides, Inc.
Represented By: Joel E. Tragesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?