Malluk v. Freeman Webb Incorporated
Plaintiff: Eddie Malluk
Defendant: Freeman Webb Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv00433
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated per filing of Voluntary Dismissal DE 11. No order to enter. (vh)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eddie Malluk (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on July 27, 2020. (Doc. No. 5.) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint proposed case management order no later than three business days before the conference. The parties shall also email a Word version of the joint proposed case management order to Newbern_Chambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov. If the proposed order cannot be submitted on time, or if all parties have not yet appeared, plaintiff's counsel is responsible for contacting the Magistrate Judge's chambers to reschedule the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/22/2020. (am)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Motion and Associate with Local Counsel. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/17/2020. (am)
June 15, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Douglas Ray Pierce. (am)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ray Pierce on behalf of Freeman Webb Incorporated (Pierce, Douglas)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pro Hac Vice Motion and Associate with Local Counsel by Eddie Malluk. (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified Text on 6/11/2020 (am).
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
May 21, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 6/11/2020. (am)
May 21, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard P. Liebowitz: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 6/11/2020. (am)
May 21, 2020 NY State Bar status verified as active for Richard P. Liebowitz. (am)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Freeman Webb Incorporated. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Freeman Webb Incorporated (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3145456), filed by Eddie Malluk. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - The Photograph, #3 Exhibit B - The Infringing Website)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malluk v. Freeman Webb Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Webb Incorporated
Represented By: Douglas Ray Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Malluk
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?