Wilson v. Risnger Bros. Transfer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terence T. Wilson
Defendant: Risnger Bros. Transfer, Inc. and Keith B. McFadden
Case Number: 3:2020cv00434
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from State of Tennesse Department of Commerce and Insurance was served on June 19, 2020, on your behalf in connection with this case, re: Geico General Insurance Company. (dt)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Since the defendant has yet to be served with process, the Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for July 21, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby RESET for August 26, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/16/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Keith B. McFadden. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Risnger Bros. Transfer, Inc. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 5/29/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
May 21, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Danny R. Ellis and Morgan G. Adams. (dt)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith B. McFadden, Risnger Bros. Transfer, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3145497), filed by Terence T. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Risnger Bros. Transfer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence T. Wilson
Represented By: Danny R. Ellis
Represented By: Morgan G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risnger Bros. Transfer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith B. McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?