King v. Briggity et al
Plaintiff: Brandon J. King
Defendant: Antonio Chambers and Brenae Briggity
Case Number: 3:2020cv00459
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Court's previous Order (Doc. No. #4 ), Plaintiff's IFP application (Doc. No. #5 ) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff is reminded that this case is closed and that any further litigation of his claims should be limited to his previous case No. 3:20-379 and handled by his appointed attorney in that case, Sara Morgan. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this Order to Ms. Morgan at the address on file in Case No. 3:20-379. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/17/2020. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail. Ms. Morgan by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 7/17/2020 (dt). Modified on 7/21/2020 (dt).
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brenae Briggity, filed by Brandon J. King.(dt)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Violation of U.S.C. Rights/Cruel Punishment filed by Brandon J. King. (dt)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Brandon J. King. (dt)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability, through appointed counsel, to amend his complaint in the prior case No. 3:20-379 to include his newly alleged facts if they form part of a pattern of mistreatment that violates his constitutional rights as a detainee. In light of Plaintiff's mental health issues and the fact that he has already been assessed a filing fee for the related case, the Court declines to assess a second filing fee in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/12/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Chief Judge Crenshaw, as it relates to an earlier filed case assigned to him. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/9/2020. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (dt)
June 2, 2020 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (dt)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brenae Briggity and Antonio Chambers, filed by Brandon J. King.(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Briggity et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenae Briggity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?