Kuilan v. Myers
Petitioner: Jamarr Juan Kuilan
Respondent: Warden Kevin Myers
Case Number: 3:2020cv00466
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTION to Notice of Appearance filed by Jamarr Juan Kuilan re #3 Notice of Appearance. (mg)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #4 Memorandum and Order Dismissing Case, (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pending before the Court is Petitioner Jamarr Juan Kuilan's pro se petition seeking a federal writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. (Doc. No. #1 .) Title 28 U.S.C. 2254 provides that a federal court may grant habeas relief to a state prisoner "only on the ground that he is in custody in violation of the Constitution or laws or treaties of the United States." 28 U.S.C. 2254(a). Because it plainly appears from the face of the petition that Petitioner is not entitled to relief under that standard, the petition is DISMISSED. Accordingly, the Court DENIES a COA. Petitioner may still seek a COA directly from the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals. Habeas Rule 11(a). This is the final order denying all relief in this case. The Clerk SHALL enter judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(b). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/6/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
June 11, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Zachary L. Barker. (mg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary L. Barker on behalf of Kevin Myers (Barker, Zachary)
June 4, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 34675059015.), filed by Jamarr Juan Kuilan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Filing Fee Receipt)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuilan v. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Kevin Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamarr Juan Kuilan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?