Kelly v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Kelly
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2020cv00488
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Vicki R. Kinkade, Acting Clerk on 7/13/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 12, 2020 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman. (vh)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Bert Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 72 of the FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for a scheduling order, for decision on all nondispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on disposition of Plaintiff's Complaint for judicial review of the decision of the Social Security Administration. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/11/2020. (vh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (service copies returned to counsel by mail) (vh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3156888), filed by Jacqueline Kelly. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)
June 11, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for William N. Benjamin, Jr. (vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Kelly
Represented By: William N. Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?