Franklin Street Corporation v. The City of Clarksville
Plaintiff: Franklin Street Corporation
Defendant: The City of Clarksville
Case Number: 3:2020cv00523
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing by The City of Clarksville re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Attachment City's MOL MSJ - Inverse Cond., #2 Attachment City's MOL MSJ - Prom. Estop., #3 Attachment City's add'l MOL MSJ - Inverse Cond., #4 Attachment FSC's Response to City's SUMF, #5 Attachment City's Motion for Status Conf.)(Goodson, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 8/17/2020. (Hearing lasted :20)(kb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing by The City of Clarksville re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Attachment FSC's Motion to Revise, #2 Attachment FSC's Motion for New Trial, #3 Attachment City Council Agenda, #4 Attachment RPC Homepage Excerpt, #5 Attachment RPC Subdivision Regs., #6 Attachment FSC's Motion re: Further Hearings, #7 Attachment City's Notice of Filing of "Motion Tracker", #8 Attachment LTR from District Attorney(s) re: ouster inv., #9 Attachment RPC Site Review Approval Docs.)(Goodson, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing by Franklin Street Corporation Corporate Disclosure (Olson, Mark)
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing by The City of Clarksville re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Attachment FSC's Motion to Assess Attorney's Fees, #2 Attachment City's Response Opposing Motion to Assess Attorney's Fees, #3 Attachment Affidavit of Joel Eckert with Ex. G thereto)(Goodson, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing by The City of Clarksville re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Attachment FSC's Notice of Appeal, #2 Attachment Order of TN Court of Appeals)(Goodson, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing by The City of Clarksville re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Attachment Circuit Court Order on Various Motions, #2 Attachment Circuit Court Order Granting City's MSJ - PE, #3 Attachment Circuit Court Order Granting Motion to Amend Judgment)(Goodson, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing by The City of Clarksville re #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Attachment FSC's Initial Complaint, #2 Attachment FSC's Amended Complaint, #3 Attachment Circuit Court Order on City's MTD)(Goodson, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Beyond the 20-page Limit for Briefs by The City of Clarksville. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Goodson, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by The City of Clarksville. (Goodson, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled on August 17, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. is RESET for the same day at 3:30 p.m. and will be held by telephone. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/13/2020. (ds)
August 13, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jeffrey Todd Goodson, Neil C. Stauffer, Lance A. Baker. (am)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by The City of Clarksville. (Goodson, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance A. Baker on behalf of The City of Clarksville (Baker, Lance)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil C. Stauffer on behalf of The City of Clarksville (Stauffer, Neil)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Todd Goodson on behalf of The City of Clarksville (Goodson, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Compel Settlement Offer and Mediation by Franklin Street Corporation. (Olson, Mark)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Franklin Street Corporation. The City of Clarksville served on 7/29/2019. (Olson, Mark)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to The City of Clarksville. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 RECEIPT #34675059178 in the amount of $400.00 (filing fee) re #1 Complaint. (vh)
June 23, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark Robert Olson, Taylor R. Dahl. (am)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2020 at 02:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City of Clarksville, filed by Franklin Street Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin Street Corporation v. The City of Clarksville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Street Corporation
Represented By: Mark Robert Olson
Represented By: Taylor R. Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Clarksville
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Goodson
Represented By: Lance A. Baker
Represented By: Neil C. Stauffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?