Purdy v. Hamilton
Plaintiff: Ashley Purdy
Defendant: Pearl Carolina Suarez Hamilton
Case Number: 3:2020cv00575
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Pearl Carolina Suarez Hamilton. (dt)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER (AFFIDAVIT) to #1 Complaint by Pearl Carolina Suarez Hamilton.(dt)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court enters this Order to put Plaintiff on notice of the phone call, and to put Defendant on notice, that unless there is an agreement between her counsel and Plaintiff's counsel, unless she is opting to proceed pro se, and unless otherwise ordered by the Court after an appropriate motion, the case management conference remains scheduled on September 29, 2020. If the parties wish to continue the initial case management conference, or if Defendant seeks a continuance, an appropriate motion must be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/10/2020. (xc: Copy of Order sent to Pearl Carolina Suarez Hamilton by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Ashley Purdy. Pearl Carolina Suarez Hamilton served on 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Service)(Goldstein, Andrew)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the conference needs to be rescheduled. It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 9:30 a.m., Tuesday, September 29, 2020. Counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and/or otherwise ensure that Defendant is aware of the rescheduled date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/6/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued as to Pearl Carolina Suarez Hamilton. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
July 6, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew P. Goldstein, Todd G. Cole and Jacob C. VanAusdall. (dt)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pearl Carolina Suarez Hamilton (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3170092), filed by Ashley Purdy. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purdy v. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Purdy
Represented By: Andrew P. Goldstein
Represented By: Todd G. Cole
Represented By: Jacob C. VanAusdall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl Carolina Suarez Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?