Lee v. WalMart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Suzanne Lee
Defendant: WalMart, Inc. doing business as Walmart Supercenter and Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00603
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone reset for 10/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference. MOTION GRANTED. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to October 21, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Case Management Conference. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/17/2020. (am)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Suzanne Lee. (Woodard, Aaron)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Substitute Party. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. added. WalMart, Inc. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/7/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by WalMart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed order)(Callaway, Gregory) Modified on 8/7/2020 (vh).
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by WalMart, Inc.(Callaway, Gregory) Modified on 8/7/2020 (vh).
July 20, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory W. Callaway, Aaron B. Woodard. (am)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment attachment to business entity disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WalMart, Inc. from Cheatham County Circuit Court, case number 6624. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3176964) (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - Summons, #3 Exhibit - Complaint)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. WalMart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart, Inc. doing business as Walmart Supercenter
Represented By: Aaron B. Woodard
Represented By: Gregory W. Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Gregory W. Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Lee
Represented By: Gregory W. Callaway
Represented By: Aaron B. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?