Farm2Table, LLC v. Society Insurance
Plaintiff: Farm2Table, LLC doing business as Sea Salt
Defendant: Society Insurance
Case Number: 3:2020cv00604
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Dismiss #6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for 9/14/2020 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/9/2020. (dt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement to file additional pages for reply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2020. (vh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; 29-page brief allowed. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2020. (jw)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint. Extension to 8/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/5/2020. (dt)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint Unopposed by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk)
July 22, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kirk Lee Clements, E. Jason Ferrell, Curtis L. Campbell, Parks T. Chastain. (dt)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Society Insurance . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executive Order No. 17, #2 Exhibit B - Executive Order No. 21, #3 Exhibit C - Executive Order No. 22, #4 Exhibit D - Amended and Restated Order 1 Chief Med Director, #5 Exhibit E - Order 3 from Chief Med Director, #6 Exhibit F - Executive Order No. 27)(Campbell, Curtis)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis)
July 20, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Curtis L. Campbell. (dt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis L. Campbell on behalf of Society Insurance (Campbell, Curtis)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Society Insurance. (dt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Society Insurance from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 20C1320. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-3177285) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exhibit A to State Court Complaint, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm2Table, LLC v. Society Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance
Represented By: E. Jason Ferrell
Represented By: Curtis L. Campbell
Represented By: Parks T. Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm2Table, LLC doing business as Sea Salt
Represented By: Kirk Lee Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?