Potts v. Cain et al (PLR3)
Plaintiff: Richard Steven Potts
Counter Plaintiff: River Edge Inn, LLC and Trey Cain
Case Number: 3:2020cv00608
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AGREED ORDER Resolving Defendant's Motion to Refer to Bankruptcy Court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/31/2020. (xc: US Bankruptcy Court Clerk) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 9/2/2020 (vh).
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Agreed Order Resolving Motion to Refer to Bankruptcy Court) filed by Trey Cain, River Edge Inn, LLC. (Abelow, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 MOTION to Refer to Bankruptcy Court filed by Trey Cain, River Edge Inn, LLC .(Abelow, Michael) Modified on 8/20/2020 (vh).
August 19, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#19 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Memorandum in Support. Counsel shall re-file the document. (vh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 ***DISREGARD SEE DE 20*** RESPONSE in Support re #18 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court filed by Trey Cain, River Edge Inn, LLC. (Abelow, Michael) Modified on 8/20/2020 (vh).
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Refer to Bankruptcy Court by Trey Cain, River Edge Inn, LLC. (Abelow, Michael) Modified on 8/19/2020 (vh).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for Monday, August 31, 2020 is hereby RESET for Tuesday, September 1, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. and shall be held by telephone conference. Lead counsel for each party shall participate in the conference. Judge Trauger's Courtroom Deputy will email to counsel the number they should call in order to participate in the conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/14/2020. (vh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 04:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
July 17, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Christina Lopez, Michael G. Abelow, and J. Brad Scarbrough. (mg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from the District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00266. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of Middle District of Tennessee. (ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER; this case to be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Signed by District Judge Pamela L. Reeves on 7/17/20. (ADA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #9 MOTION to Change Venue Agreed Order by Trey Cain, River Edge Inn, LLC. (Lopez, Christina) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Trey Cain, River Edge Inn, LLC. (Lopez, Christina) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue by Trey Cain, River Edge Inn, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Adversary Complaint)(Lopez, Christina) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/16/2020. (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/16/2020. (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/16/2020. (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 16, 2020 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Richard Steven Potts by River Edge Inn, LLC and Trey Cain. (Originally filed in state court) (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Trey Cain, River Edge Inn, LLC. (Lopez, Christina) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Trey Cain, River Edge Inn, LLC. (Lopez, Christina) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sevier County Chancery Court, case number 19-10-203. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4376196), filed by River Edge Inn, LLC, Trey Cain. (Attachments: #1 Supplement State Court Summons, #2 Supplement State Court Complaint, #3 Supplement State Court Answer and Counterclaim)(Lopez, Christina) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potts v. Cain et al (PLR3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Steven Potts
Represented By: J. Brad Scarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: River Edge Inn, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Abelow
Represented By: Christina Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Trey Cain
Represented By: Michael G. Abelow
Represented By: Christina Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?