Delauter v. The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II et al
Plaintiff: Brian Delauter
Defendant: The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II and Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00609
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The initial case management conference is rescheduled for October 22, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. to be held telephonically. Counsel for each party shall call (877) 402-9753 and use access code 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 8/31/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This matter shall be TRANSFERRED to Magistrate Judge Barbara Holmes as related to Vest v. Nissan, Case No. 3:19-cv-1021. The initial case management conference set on September 1, 2020, is CANCELLED and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Holmes. The motion to continue the initial case management conference is FOUND MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/26/2020. (vh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: After consultation with Judge Eli Richardson, this action is TRANSFERRED to Judge Richardson as an earlier-filed related case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/21/2020. (vh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference, Unopposed by Brian Delauter. (Lyle, Paige)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on September 1, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. (Doc. No. 5.) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint proposed case management order no later than three business days before the conference. The parties shall also email a Word version of the joint proposed case management order to Newbern_Chambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov. If the proposed order cannot be submitted on time, or if all parties have not yet appeared, plaintiff's counsel is responsible for contacting the Magistrate Judge's chambers to reschedule the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/20/2020. (am)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Delauter. All Defendants. (Loofbourrow, Ryan)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Nissan North America, Inc., The and Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh) Modified on 7/31/2020 (vh).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/20/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (vh)
July 17, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kevin C. Klein, Paige M. Lyle, Ryan P. Loofbourrow. (am)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc., The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3177912), filed by Brian Delauter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - The Plan, #3 Exhibit 2 - Jan. 15, 2020 Email to C. Reecer, #4 Exhibit 3 - Jan. 15, 2020 Email from C. Reecer, #5 Exhibit 4 - Feb. 19, 2020 Email to P. Pundor, #6 Exhibit 5 - Feb. 25, 2020 Email from P. Pundor, #7 Exhibit 6 - May 1, 2020 Email to P. Pundor, #8 Exhibit 7 - May 6, 2020 Email to P. Pundor, #9 Exhibit 8 - May 12, 2020 Email to C. Reecer, #10 Exhibit 9 - May 12, 2020 Email from C. Reecer, #11 Exhibit 10 - Emails from J. Bobbitt)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delauter v. The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nissan Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Delauter
Represented By: Paige M. Lyle
Represented By: Ryan P. Loofbourrow
Represented By: Kevin C. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?