Doe v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: William Lee and David Rausch
Case Number: 3:2020cv00610
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court declines to exercise jurisdiction in this case, based on the abstention doctrine in Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971). Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #16 ) is DENIED and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUIDCE. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/21/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 24 Sealed Document filed by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
August 20, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to re #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by William Lee, David Rausch. (Mitchell, Robert)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Doc. No. #16 , "Motion"). Defendants shall respond to the Motion on or before the close of business on Wednesday, August 19, 2020. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 Sealed Document filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Ex. A_Declaration, #2 Exhibit Sealed Ex. B_Judgment, #3 Exhibit Sealed Ex. C_Probation Discharge, #4 Exhibit Sealed Ex. D_Termination Orders)(Mothershead, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal UNOPPOSED by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by John Doe . (Mothershead, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment PROPOSED TRO)(Mothershead, Kyle)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESET for October 7, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate and shall file a joint proposed initial case management order no later than three days before the conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/7/2020. (vh)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Extension to 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/7/2020. (vh)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference by William Lee, David Rausch. (Mitchell, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by William Lee, David Rausch. (Mitchell, Robert)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and for decision on Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym (Doc. No. #9 ). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
August 4, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Miranda H. Jones and Robert W. Mitchell. (vh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM - UNOPPOSED filed by John Doe . (Mothershead, Kyle)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM - UNOPPOSED by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Mothershead, Kyle)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Mitchell on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Mitchell, Robert)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Miranda H. Jones on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Jones, Miranda)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by John Doe. William Lee served on 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Service Accepted)(Mothershead, Kyle)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by John Doe. David Rausch served on 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Service Accepted)(Mothershead, Kyle)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons issued as to William Lee and David Rausch. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 17, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle F. Mothershead. (dt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Lee and David Rausch (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3178119), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lee
Represented By: Miranda H. Jones
Represented By: Robert W. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rausch
Represented By: Miranda H. Jones
Represented By: Robert W. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Kyle F. Mothershead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?