Houston v. Berry's Container Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Greg Houston
Defendant: Travis Wotford and Berry's Container Service, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00615
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/23/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (dt)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Berry's Container Service, LLC and Travis Wotford. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
July 20, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Randall W. Burton. (dt)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berry's Container Service, LLC and Travis Wotford (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3178812), filed by Greg Houston. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. Berry's Container Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Houston
Represented By: Randall W. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Wotford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berry's Container Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?