Cope et al v. Equifax et al
Plaintiff: Denise Cope and Max Cope
Defendant: Fox Collections, Equifax, Transunion and Experian
Case Number: 3:2020cv00689
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Because Plaintiffs have failed to comply with the Court's order concerning these threshold matters necessary to prosecute this action, the Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/17/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return the complaint to the Plaintiffs at their listed address. To be considered a Plaintiff in this action, Max Cope MUST sign and return the complaint within 21 DAYS of the date this Order is entered on the docket. Max Cope is warned that failure to comply with this order, or to request an extension of time to comply before the deadline, may result in the dismissal of his claims. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/21/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (Pro se party sent DE: #1 by regular mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) Modified on 8/21/2020 (am).
August 18, 2020 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (am)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Denise Cope, Max Cope. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Order)(am)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax, Experian, Fox Collections, Transunion, filed by Max Cope, Denise Cope.(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cope et al v. Equifax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Collections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?