Hatchet v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Mike Govender Hatchet
Defendant: Daniel W. Andrade, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 3:2020cv00693
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on October 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Doc. No. 4.) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint proposed case management order no later than three business days before the conference. The parties shall also email a Word version of the joint proposed case management order to Newbern_Chambers@tnmd.uscourts.gov. If the proposed order cannot be submitted on time, or if all parties have not yet appeared, plaintiff's counsel is responsible for contacting the Magistrate Judge's chambers to reschedule the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/7/2020. (am)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chad Wolf, Kenneth Cuccinelli, D. Andrade on September 17, 2020 by Mike Govender Hatchet. All Defendants. (Fogle, Jr., H.)
September 28, 2020 (TN & TNMD) State Bar status verified as active for Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon admitted to this court. (am)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon on behalf of Daniel W. Andrade, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes)
August 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the motion to appear pro hac vice of H. Glenn Fogle, Jr., is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade on 08/23/2020. (vk)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/14/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney H. Glen Fogle from the United States District Court for the Middle of Tennessee filed by Mike Govender Hatchet. (Buchanan, Bruce)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Daniel W. Andrade, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf, Donald Cochran, William Barr. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am)
August 13, 2020 State Bar status verified as active for (TN) Bruce E. Buchanan, (GA) H. Glenn Fogle. (am)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney H. Glenn Fogle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3195441) by Mike Govender Hatchet. (Buchanan, Bruce)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel W. Andrade, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3194574), filed by Mike Govender Hatchet. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- I-130, #3 Exhibit 2 - I-485 Receipt, #4 Exhibit 3 - I-485 Application, #5 Exhibit 4 - I-485 Cover Letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - Request for Evidence, #7 Exhibit 6 - Response to RFE, #8 Exhibit 7 - Decision January 24, 2019, #9 Exhibit 8 - I-290B, #10 Exhibit 9 - Reopen Notice, #11 Exhibit 10 - Decision May 19, 2020)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatchet v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel W. Andrade
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Govender Hatchet
Represented By: H. Glenn Fogle
Represented By: Bruce E. Buchanan
Represented By: H. Glenn Fogle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?