Thompson v. United States of America
Petitioner: Ricky Thompson
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00700
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by Ricky Thompson. (kc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by United States of America. (Glover, John)
September 2, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for John Ross Glover. (vh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America (Substitution of Counsel) (Glover, John)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Petitioner's Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 To Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (Doc. No. #1 , "Motion"). The Government shall respond to the Motion on or before September 24, 2020. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/25/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (kc)
August 18, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (vh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Ricky Thompson.(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Brent Adams Hannafan
Represented By: John Ross Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricky Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?