Holland v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Karen Holland
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00706
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Boyd, Martha)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Karen Holland. (Rieger, George)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Motion #10 is GRANTED for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Due September 23, 2020. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/10/2020. (mg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Karen Holland. (Rieger, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF TRANSFER RECORD from Montgomery County Circuit Court. (vh) Modified on 9/2/2020 (vh).
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Barrett, Christopher)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. . (Boyd, Martha)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Boyd, Martha)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/20/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
August 19, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for George H. Rieger, II, Martha L. Boyd, and Christopher J. Barrett. (mg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number CC2020-CV-1378. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3198384) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael Benjamin, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Holland
Represented By: George H. Rieger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Martha L. Boyd
Represented By: Christopher J. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?