Leonard v. Tennessee, State of
Plaintiff: Corrie J. Leonard
Defendant: Tennessee, State of
Case Number: 3:2020cv00707
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: More than 30 days have passed with no action by Ms. Leonard. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to close this case without judgment. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/29/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Corrie Leonard, a state inmate in the Debra Johnson Rehabilitation Center in Nashville, Tennessee, filed a pro se complaint that is styled as an action in the Middle Division of the Tennessee Claims Commission but was mailed to this Court. (Doc. No. #1 at 1, 15.) Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return Ms. Leonard's original documents to her and retain a copy for the Court's file. If Ms. Leonard takes no further action in this Court within 30 days, this case will be closed without judgment. However, if Ms. Leonard did indeed intend to bring her claim against the State of Tennessee in this Court, she is advised that a complaint may not be filed as a civil action or considered on the merits unless it is accompanied by a $400 filing fee. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Ms. Leonard a new blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of Administrative Order 93. If she seeks to proceed with this lawsuit, despite the shortcomings mentioned above, she MUST either pay the $400.00 filing fee in full or complete the IFP application and return the properly completed application, along with a current six-month trust account statement, to the Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/24/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with the return of the original Complaint and an IFP application.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified on 8/24/2020 (mg).
August 20, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tennessee, State of, filed by Corrie J. Leonard.(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Tennessee, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corrie J. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?