Chapman v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Chapman
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Does 1 through 100, Inclusive, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00709
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
2 Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joey P. Leniski, Jr. (vh)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steve Schulte is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade on 09/14/2020. (vk)
September 10, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for attorney Steve Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3212571) by Matthew Chapman. (Leniski, Joey)
September 10, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Joey P. Leniski, Jr on behalf of Matthew Chapman (Leniski, Joey)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Before the Court is the joint motion of Plaintiff Matthew Chapman and Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (collectively, the "Parties") to stay this litigation while the Parties finalize a settlement reached in principle by the Parties. Finding that a stay will facilitate further settlement negotiations and promote judicial economy, and finding that the Parties agree to the requested relief, the Court finds the joint motion well-taken. It is, therefore, ORDERED that all deadlines in this matter are STAYED until February 1, 2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/31/2020. (vh)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/31/2020. (vh)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall term as moot the pending Motions to Dismiss (Doc. Nos. #2 , #8 ). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/31/2020. (vh)
August 31, 2020 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Stay by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Drinkwater, William)
August 31, 2020 Filing 34 JOINT Statement Regarding Pending Motions filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. in support of #29 Order,,,, Add and Terminate Judge,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,. (Ramsey, Shane)
August 28, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation to Dismiss Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Ramsey, Shane)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jordan E Jarreau and Melissa Dorman Matthews terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/26/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Drinkwater, William)
August 21, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 03:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (vh)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Upon the reassignment of this case to Judge Trauger, it is hereby ORDERED that the reference to the magistrate judge is WITHDRAWN, and the initial case management conference scheduled before him on November 3, 2020 is CANCELLED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue Judge Trauger's standard Notice, setting this case for an initial case management conference before her on October 5, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. It is further ORDERED that, by September 4, 2020, the parties shall file a joint statement, informing the court whether any motions still pending when this case was transferred to this court still need to be ruled upon or whether they may be termed by the Clerk as moot. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/21/2020. (vh)
August 21, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Shane G. Ramsey and William W. Drinkwater. (vh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Drinkwater on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation (Drinkwater, William)
August 21, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane G. Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation (Ramsey, Shane)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: This matter is hereby transferred to District Judge Aleta Trauger as related to case no. 3:15-cv-00533, which is currently pending before her. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 08/21/2020. (vh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (vh)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa Dorman Matthews, Jordan E Jarreau, Eric Martin Przybysz, Steven Scott Schulte, and Darren McDowell: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 9/10/2020. (vh)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa Dorman Matthews, Jordan E Jarreau, Eric Martin Przybysz, Steven Scott Schulte, and Darren McDowell: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/10/2020. (vh)
August 20, 2020 TX State Bar status verified as active for Melissa Dorman Matthews, Jordan E Jarreau, Eric Martin Przybysz, Steven Scott Schulte, and Darren McDowell. (vh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from the District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02318. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Dennis Aaron's case be severed and transferred to the Huntsville Division of the Northern District of Alabama (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2316-S Opened); b. Plaintiff Sharon Blackstone's case be severed and transferred to the Philadelphia Division of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2317-S Opened); c. Plaintiff Matthew Chapman's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2318-S Opened); d. Plaintiff Ricky Cole's case be severed and transferred to the Pikeville Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2319-S Opened); e. Plaintiff Duane Fielder's c ase be severed and transferred to the Reno Division of the District of Nevada (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2320-S Opened);f. Plaintiff Stanley Green's case be severed and transferred to the Harrisburg Division of the Middle District of Pennsylvania (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2321-S Opened); g. Plaintiff Kimberly McCray's case be severed and transferred to the Springfield Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2322-S Opened); h. Plaintiff Lucille Tisdale's case be severed and transferred to the Springfield Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2323-S Opened);i. Plaintiff Kelly Warner's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil Case 3:20-cv-2324-S Opened). Plaintiff Dora Sirmons is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/18/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale, Kelly Warner re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale, Kelly Warner re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale, Kelly Warner (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale, Kelly Warner re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale, Kelly Warner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Completed Plaintiff Forms) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 Agreed MOTION to Extend Time Resp/Reply filed by Dennis Aaron, Sharon Blackstone, Matthew Chapman, Ricky Cole, Duane Fielder, Stanley Green, Kimberly McCray, Dora Sirmons, Lucille Tisdale (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Przybysz, Eric) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 12 replaced to flatten image on 6/17/2020) (dsr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Becton, Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) Modified corporate parent on 6/12/2020 (mla). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge David C Godbey no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/10/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10903783) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corp, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Shane G. Ramsey
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Shane G. Ramsey
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Shane G. Ramsey
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Chapman
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Represented By: Joey P. Leniski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?