Holmes v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Holmes
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, C.R. Bard, Inc., Does 1 through 100, Inclusive and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00717
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER STAYING CASE: Upon consideration of the Parties' JOINT MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES, and for good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties' Motion #35 is GRANTED, and discovery and all pretrial deadlines are hereby stayed and the initial Case Management Conference in this case is hereby continued for 90 days after entry of this Order to allow the Parties to conduct ongoing settlement negotiations. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2020 is continued. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/23/2020. (mg)
September 23, 2020 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Drinkwater, William)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Motion #33 is GRANTED dismissing Plaintiff's Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice. McKesson Corporation (a Corporation) terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/22/2020. (mg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Drinkwater, William)
September 1, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Shane G. Ramsey, William W. Drinkwater. (mg)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jordan E Jarreau and Melissa Dorman Matthews terminated. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/27/2020. (am)
August 26, 2020 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Drinkwater, William)
August 26, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Drinkwater on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation (Drinkwater, William)
August 26, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane G. Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation (Ramsey, Shane)
August 24, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 03:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
August 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
August 24, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
August 24, 2020 TX State Bar status verified as active for Melissa Dorman Matthews, Jordan E Jarreau, Eric Martin Przybysz, Steven Scott Schulte, and Darren McDowell. (mg)
August 24, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa Dorman Matthews, Jordan E Jarreau, Eric Martin Przybysz, Steven Scott Schulte, Darren McDowell: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/14/2020. (mg)
August 24, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa Dorman Matthews, Jordan E Jarreau, Eric Martin Przybysz, Steven Scott Schulte, Darren McDowell: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 9/14/2020. (mg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 Case transferred in from the District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02424. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 8/24/2020 (mg).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER grants #19 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Eileena Donnell's case be severed and transferred to the Boston Division of the District of Massachusetts (Civil case 3:20-cv-2422 opened); b. Plaintiff Michael Hanson's case be severed and transferred to the Tacoma Division of the Western District of Washington (Civil case 3:20-cv-2423 opened); c. Plaintiff Shirley Holmes's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2424 opened); d. Plaintiff Katherine Howell's case be severed and transferred to the Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2425 opened); e. Plaintiff Margaret Palmiter's case be severed and transferred to the Kalamazoo Division of the Western District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2426 opened); f. Plaintiff Craig Robinson's case be severed and transferred to the Fayetteville Division of the Western District of Arkansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2428 opened); g. Plaintiff Velvet Ronquillo's case be severed and transferred to the Muskogee Division of the Eastern District of Oklahoma (Civil case 3:20-cv-2429 opened); and h. Plaintiff Tracy Turner's case be severed and transferred to the Fort Lauderdale Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2430 opened). Plaintiff Linda Miller is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/20/2020) (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' agreement, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Robyn Kennedy's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their ovm costs. Party Robyn Kennedy terminated. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Eileena Donnell, Michael Hanson, Shirley Holmes, Katherine Howell, Robyn Kennedy, Linda Miller, Margaret Palmiter, Craig Robinson, Velvet Ronquillo, Tracy Turner re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Eileena Donnell, Michael Hanson, Shirley Holmes, Katherine Howell, Robyn Kennedy, Linda Miller, Margaret Palmiter, Craig Robinson, Velvet Ronquillo, Tracy Turner re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Eileena Donnell, Michael Hanson, Shirley Holmes, Katherine Howell, Robyn Kennedy, Linda Miller, Margaret Palmiter, Craig Robinson, Velvet Ronquillo, Tracy Turner (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Eileena Donnell, Michael Hanson, Shirley Holmes, Katherine Howell, Robyn Kennedy, Linda Miller, Margaret Palmiter, Craig Robinson, Velvet Ronquillo, Tracy Turner re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Eileena Donnell, Michael Hanson, Shirley Holmes, Katherine Howell, Robyn Kennedy, Linda Miller, Margaret Palmiter, Craig Robinson, Velvet Ronquillo, Tracy Turner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Eileena Donnell, Michael Hanson, Shirley Holmes, Katherine Howell, Robyn Kennedy, Linda Miller, Margaret Palmiter, Craig Robinson, Velvet Ronquillo, Tracy Turner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The above-numbered case is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Judge Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S." Judge Ada Brown no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/24/2020) (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 11 replaced with the document flattened on 6/17/2020) (pnp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900626) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Jury Demand, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Dismissal Hearing Notice, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Shane G. Ramsey
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Shane G. Ramsey
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Shane G. Ramsey
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Holmes
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?