Abbington Heights v. Gordon
Plaintiff: Kasyhae Gordon and Abbington Heights
Case Number: 3:2020cv00746
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to #5 Order Dismissing Case. (ln)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #5 Order Dismissing Case. (mg)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Defendant Kasyhae Gordon, a pro se Tennessee resident, filed a "Petition for Removal and Federal Stay of Eviction Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)," that the court interpreted as a notice of removal concerning Davidson County General Sessions Court case number 20-GT-2653. (See Doc. No. #1 .) The court concludes that the defendant has not met her burden of demonstrating that this court has subject-matter jurisdiction over this case. Accordingly, the Clerk shall REMAND this action to the Davidson County General Sessions Court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/9/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. In addition, a certified copy of this Order sent by certified mail to the Davidson County General Sessions Court.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Defendant Kasyhae Gordon, a pro se Tennessee resident, has filed a "Petition for Removal and Federal Stay of Eviction Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)," which the court interprets as a notice of removal concerning Davidson County General Sessions Court case number 20-GT-2653. (Doc. No. #1 .) At the time of removal, the defendant also filed an application to proceed as a pauper. (Doc. No. #2 .) For good cause shown, the defendant's application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs (Doc. No. #2 ) is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to waive the removal fee in this case. Accordingly, the defendant MUST file in this court, within 21 days of the entry of this order, the following: (1) a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon her in the state court action, or confirmation that all such documents have been provided to the court; (2) confirmation that the defendant has provided a copy of the notice of removal to the state court clerk; and (3) a certificate of service showing that a copy of the notice of removal has been served upon the plaintiff. The defendant is further DIRECTED to immediately serve a copy of this order upon the plaintiff, by regular U.S. mail, at the same address used to serve the notice of removal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/10/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 3, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 3, 2020 ***Pro Se filer failed to include the State Court Complaint with their filing.*** (mg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kasyhae Gordon. (mg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kasyhae Gordon from State Court of Davidson County, case number 20-GT-2653. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbington Heights v. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasyhae Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbington Heights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?