Taylor v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Caleb Taylor
Defendant: Kristen Smith, (f/n/u) Radtke, (f/n/u) Mauldin, Sgt. (f/n/u) Winslow, Judge (f/n/u) Carter, (f/n/u) Gambina and Judge (f/n/u) Hunter
Case Number: 3:2020cv00747
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The court dismissed this case for failure to state a claim on September 9, 2020. (Doc. No. #4 .) It is back before the court on the plaintiff's "Motion to Request Ext[ra] Copies That Was Sent to the Court." (Doc. No. #7 .) Accordingly, the plaintiffs Motion (Doc. No. #7 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/30/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to request extra copies that was sent to the Court by Caleb Taylor. (dt)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE - Violation of the Fifth Amendment by Caleb Taylor. (Note: There is no written content to this pleading.) (mg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #4 Order Dismissing Case, (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg) Modified on 9/9/2020 (mg).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Caleb Taylor, a pretrial detainee in the Sumner County Jail in Gallatin, Tennessee, has filed a pro se civil rights action under 42 U.S.C. 1983. (Doc. No. #1 .) The matter is before the court for a ruling on the plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). (Doc. No. #2 .) In addition, the complaint (Doc. No. #1 ) is before the court for an initial review pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Because it appears from the plaintiff's submission that he lacks sufficient financial resources from which to pay the full filing fee in advance, the court GRANTS his motion (Doc. No. #2 ) to proceed IFP in this matter. However, under Section 1915(b), the plaintiff nonetheless remains responsible for paying the filing fee. Accordingly, the plaintiff is hereby ASSESSED a $350 filing fee. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to the administrator of the Sumner County Jail to ensure that the custodian of the plaintiff's inmate trust account complies with the portion of 28 U.S.C. 1915 pertaining to payment of the filing fee. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A. Any appeal of this order would not be in good faith as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). This is the final order denying all relief in this matter. The Clerk SHALL enter judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(b). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/9/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with a Copy of this Order by regular mail to the administrator of the Sumner County Jail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
September 2, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Caleb Taylor. (mg)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against (f/n/u) Carter, (f/n/u) Gambina, (f/n/u) Hunter, (f/n/u) Mauldin, (f/n/u) Radtke, Kristen Smith, (f/n/u) Winslow, filed by Caleb Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Continuation of Complaint) (mg) Modified on 9/2/2020 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Radtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. (f/n/u) Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge (f/n/u) Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Gambina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge (f/n/u) Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?