Rainey v. T.T.C.C./CCA et al
Plaintiff: Terrence Rainey
Defendant: f/n/u Hernandez, T.T.C.C./CCA, f/n/u Dorton, Assistant Warden f/n/u Vantell, Warden Raymond Byrd and CoreCivic, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00771
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Assessing Filing Fee for Terrence Rainey: Plaintiff's IFP application #2 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is assessed the $350 civil filing fee. The Clerk of Court MUST send a copy of this Order to the warden of the facility where Plaintiff is currently housed to ensure compliance with that portion of 28 U.S.C. 1915 pertaining to the payment of the filing fee. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court finds that Plaintiff has stated a nonfrivolous claim against Defendant Hernandez. Accordingly, the Clerk is INSTRUCTED to send Plaintiff a service packet (blank summons and USM 285 form) for this Defendant. Plaintiff MUST complete the service packet and return it to the Clerk's Office within 21 days of the date of this Order. Upon return of the completed service packet, PROCESS SHALL ISSUE. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. No. #5 ) is DENIED without prejudice to refiling if warranted by future developments in the case. Plaintiff's motions for discovery (Doc. Nos. #7 & #10 ) are DENIED as premature. Any issues related to discovery will be taken up, as necessary, by the Magistrate Judge after service of process is accomplished. Plaintiff's proposed orders to show cause (Doc. Nos. #6 & #11 ) are also prematurely filed in advance of service of process, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate them as pending motions. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/19/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail w/blank service packet & Warden. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/19/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Terrence Rainey. (vh)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Raymond Byrd, f/n/u Hernandez, and CoreCivic, Inc., filed by Terrence Rainey.(vh)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order by Terrence Rainey. (vh)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for an Order Compelling Discovery by Terrence Rainey. (Attachments: #1 First Request for Production of Documents, #2 First Set of Interrogatories)(vh)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS by Terrence Rainey. (vh)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT/COMPLAINT JURISDICTION AND VENUE filed by Terrence Rainey re #1 Complaint. (vh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for an Order Compelling Discovery by Terrence Rainey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Attachment Summons and Envelope)(dt)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, for Preliminary Injunction and for Temporary Restraining Order by Terrence Rainey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment First Request of Production of Documents)(dt)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Terrence Rainey. (vh)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Raymond Byrd, f/n/u Dorton, f/n/u Hernandez, T.T.C.C./CCA and f/n/u Vantell, filed by Terrence Rainey.(vh)
September 10, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (vh)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Terrence Rainey. (vh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raymond Byrd, f/n/u Dorton, f/n/u Hernandez, T.T.C.C./CCA, and f/n/u Vantell, filed by Terrence Rainey.(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainey v. T.T.C.C./CCA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.T.C.C./CCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f/n/u Dorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Warden f/n/u Vantell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Raymond Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?