Stephens v. Waverly, City of et al
Plaintiff: Carson Stephens
Defendant: W. B. Frazier and Waverly, City of
Case Number: 3:2020cv00858
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Joint filed by Carson Stephens. (Collins, Heather)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for Tuesday, December 1, 2020 at 4:00 p.m. will be held by teleconference. Lead counsel for each party shall participate in the conference. ( Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 12/1/2020 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger.).Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by W. B. Frazier, Waverly, City of.(Mazzota, William)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Ryan Simmons on behalf of W. B. Frazier, Waverly, City of (Simmons, A.)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Extension to 11/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 20-858. (dt)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by W. B. Frazier, Waverly, City of. (Mazzota, William)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Carson Stephens. W. B. Frazier served on 10/13/2020. (Hunter, Anne)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Carson Stephens. Waverly, City of served on 10/13/2020. (Hunter, Anne)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to W. B. Frazier and City of Waverly. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 4:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
October 2, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Heather M. Collins, Anne Hunter and Ashley S. Walter admitted to this court. (dt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W. B. Frazier and City of Waverly (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3228184), filed by Carson Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Waverly, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carson Stephens
Represented By: Heather M. Collins
Represented By: Anne Hunter
Represented By: Ashley S. Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. B. Frazier
Represented By: William C. Mazzota
Represented By: A. Ryan Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waverly, City of
Represented By: William C. Mazzota
Represented By: A. Ryan Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?