Garrett v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Katrina Marie Garrett
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2020cv00863
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bert W. Coleman is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/1/2020. (vk) Modified on 12/1/2020 (vk).
November 16, 2020 KS State Bar status verified as active for Bert Coleman not admitted to this court - Local counsel not required. (ln)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bert Coleman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Coleman, Bert)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Bert W. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee waived) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, District of Kansas)(Coleman, Bert) Modified on 11/16/2020 (ln).
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney's Office, Office of General Counsel, and United States Attorney General on 11/02/2020 by Katrina Marie Garrett. (Palmer, Melissa)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Melissa A. Palmer is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 10/14/2020.
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Docket No. 2) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/7/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3230112) by Katrina Marie Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Palmer, Melissa)
October 6, 2020 NY State Bar status verified as active for Melissa A. Palmer not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (am)
October 6, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melissa A. Palmer: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/27/2020. (am)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Katrina Marie Garrett. (am)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Katrina Marie Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Attachment - Letter to the Clerk)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Marie Garrett
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Bert Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?