Laymon v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County d/b/a Metropolitan Nashville Public Schools
Plaintiff: Erma Laymon
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County d/b/a Metropolitan Nashville Public Schools and Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County doing business as Metropolitan Nashville Public Schools
Case Number: 3:2020cv00864
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County answer due 12/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/24/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(bs) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (hb).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison L. Bussell on behalf of Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County (Bussell, Allison)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County. (Ayers, John)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Ayers on behalf of Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County (Ayers, John)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Erma Laymon. Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County served on 11/2/2020. (Baker, Melissa)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County d/b/a Metropolitan Nashville Public Schools, filed by Erma Laymon.(dt)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend Complaint to Correct Case No. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/23/2020. (dt)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Replace Civil Cover Sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/23/2020. (dt)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/8/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, correcting case number by Erma Laymon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to correct case no in style of case and add reference note to previous case)(Baker, Melissa)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, Attachment 1-1 Cover Sheet by Erma Laymon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Cover Sheet with home address removed)(Baker, Melissa)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons issued as to Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County d/b/a Metropolitan Nashville Public Schools. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (kc)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3229549), filed by Erma Laymon. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A EEOC Complaint Discrimination, #3 Exhibit B EEOC Complaint Retaliation, #4 Exhibit C EEOC Notice of Rights Retaliation)(kc) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/26/2020 per Order #8 ) (dt). Modified on 10/26/2020 (dt).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Melissa A. Baker admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laymon v. Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County d/b/a Metropolitan Nashville Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erma Laymon
Represented By: Melissa A. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County d/b/a Metropolitan Nashville Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government of Nashville and Davidson County doing business as Metropolitan Nashville Public Schools
Represented By: John W. Ayers
Represented By: Allison L. Bussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?