Boggs v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Brenda Gail Boggs
Defendant: Social Security Administration, William Pelham Barr and Donald Q. Cochran
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2020cv00867
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeremiah D. Hayes is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/1/2020. (vk)
November 24, 2020 MO State Bar status verified as active for Jeremiah D. Hayes not admitted to this court - Local counsel not required. (ln)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Jeremiah D. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee waived) by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Jeremiah) Modified on 11/24/2020 (ln).
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Brenda Gail Boggs. Social Security Administration served on 10/20/2020. (Reasonover, Julie)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Brenda Gail Boggs. William Pelham Barr served on 10/21/2020. (Reasonover, Julie)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by Brenda Gail Boggs. Donald Q. Cochran served on 10/20/2020. (Reasonover, Julie)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b), Fed.R.Civ.P., and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/9/2020. (mg)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3230568), filed by Brenda Gail Boggs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
October 7, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Julie A. Reasonover admitted to this court. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boggs v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Gail Boggs
Represented By: Julie A. Reasonover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeremiah D. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Q. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?