Davis v. Cavender et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Davis
Defendant: Tony J. Cavender, The Jones Company of Tennessee, LLC and Otter Creek Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00877
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy Neil O'Connor and Thomas V. White admitted to this court. (ln)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Neil O'Connor and Thomas V. White on behalf of The Jones Company of Tennessee, LLC (O'Connor, Timothy) Modified on 12/10/2020 (ln).
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on December 8, 2020 (Doc. No. #8 ). Defendant The Jones Company of Tennessee, LLC, has not yet appeared. Accordingly, the conference is RESET for January 6, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/07/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
December 7, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for William L. Penny, Garry K. Grooms, and Kathryn E. Grundy admitted to this court. (ln)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William L. Penny, Garry K. Grooms, and Kathryn Grundy on behalf of Tony J. Cavender and Otter Creek Holdings, LLC (Penny, William) Modified on 12/7/2020 (ln).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on December 8, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. (Doc. No. #4 .) The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Counsel need not and should not appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/20/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aaron Davis. (Briley, Clifton)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Tony J. Cavender, Otter Creek Holdings, LLC, The Jones Company of Tennessee, LLC. Counsel requested that service copies be picked-up, but due to COVID-19, service copies will be returned to counsel (C. David Briley) by mail. (mg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
October 13, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Clifton David Briley admitted to this court. (mg)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tony J. Cavender, Otter Creek Holdings, LLC, The Jones Company of Tennessee, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3233271), filed by Aaron Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Intent Letter, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Cavender et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony J. Cavender
Represented By: Garry K. Grooms
Represented By: William L. Penny
Represented By: Kathryn E. Grundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jones Company of Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Neil O'Connor
Represented By: Thomas V. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otter Creek Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Garry K. Grooms
Represented By: William L. Penny
Represented By: Kathryn E. Grundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Davis
Represented By: Clifton David Briley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?