Corizon, LLC v. Wainwright et al
Plaintiff: Corizon, LLC
Defendant: Maggie Wilson, John Does 1-10, Michael F. Perry, Tony C. Parker, Priscilla Wainwright, Centurion of Tennessee, LLC and additonal employees of the State of Tennessee operating in their official capacities
Case Number: 3:2020cv00892
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The motion is granted. Defendants are permitted to file thirty-five page briefs in support of their motions to dismiss. Plaintiff is permitted to file thirty-five page responses. Defendants are permitted to file ten page replies. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/17/2020. (am)
December 16, 2020 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Centurion of Tennessee, LLC. (Donnell, R.)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Pending before the Court are two Motions to Dismiss, one from Defendant Centurion (Doc. No. 43) and one from the State Defendants (Doc. No. 45). Plaintiff filed a Response asserting mootness (Doc. No. 48) and a Motion to Extend its Time to Respond Substantively to Defendants' Pending Motions to Dismiss (Doc. No. 49). In light of the filing of the Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 47), which has become the operative complaint in this case, Defendants' pending Motions to Dismiss (Doc. Nos. 43, 45) and Plaintiff's motion requesting an extension of its time to respond (Doc. No. 49) are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/9/2020. (am)
December 8, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #43 MOTION to Dismiss , #45 MOTION to Dismiss to Respond Substantively by Corizon, LLC. (Parham, W. Travis)
December 8, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss , #45 MOTION to Dismiss Asserting Mootness filed by Corizon, LLC. (Parham, W. Travis)
December 8, 2020 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Corizon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: RFP Release 1, #2 Exhibit B: RFP Amendment 18, #3 Exhibit C: Internal Landers Communication, #4 Exhibit D: Landers-Centurion Communications, #5 Exhibit E: RFP Release 2, #6 Exhibit F: Landers TDOC Resignation Form, #7 Exhibit G: Alsup-Wilson Communications, #8 Exhibit H: June 4, 2020 Letter and Corizon Response, #9 Exhibit I: Young-Wilson Communications, #10 Exhibit J: Inmate BH Contract, #11 Exhibit K: Performance Bond, #12 Exhibit L: Ethics Policy)(Parham, W. Travis)
November 24, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support of #45 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Does 1-10, Tony C. Parker, Michael F. Perry, Priscilla Wainwright, Maggie Wilson . (Shew, Dianna)
November 24, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss by John Does 1-10, Tony C. Parker, Michael F. Perry, Priscilla Wainwright, Maggie Wilson. (Shew, Dianna)
November 24, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support of #43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Centurion of Tennessee, LLC . (Sims, W.)
November 24, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss by Centurion of Tennessee, LLC. (Sims, W.)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Therefore, for the reasons discussed, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. (Doc. No. 2). The Court STRIKES Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum of Law Seeking Limited Expedited Discovery. (Doc. No. 4). The Court additionally GRANTS Defendants an extension until November 24, 2020 to file motions to dismiss. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 3, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE by John Does 1-10, Tony C. Parker, Michael F. Perry, Priscilla Wainwright, Maggie Wilson re #35 Memorandum Opinion of the Court, #36 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, (Shew, Dianna)
November 3, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Corizon, LLC re #4 MOTION and Memorandum of Law Seeking Limited Expedited Discovery Striking Motion (Parham, W. Travis)
November 3, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE by Centurion of Tennessee, LLC re #35 Memorandum Opinion of the Court, #36 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, NOTICE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND PLAINTIFFS REMAINING REQUESTED RELIEF (Sims, W.) Modified Text on 11/4/2020 (am).
November 3, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE by Corizon, LLC re #35 Memorandum Opinion of the Court WITH RESPECT TO WHETHER A HEARING IS REQUIRED ON CORIZONS PENDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND REGARDING CORIZONS REMAINING REQUESTED RELIEF (Parham, W. Travis)
November 3, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION and Memorandum of Law Seeking Limited Expedited Discovery filed by Priscilla Wainwright. (Shew, Dianna)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the Memorandum Opinion filed contemporaneously herewith, Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. 2, Motion) is DENIED IN PART and DEFERRED IN PART. Specifically, the Motion is denied as to Plaintiff's request for a Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) but remains pending as to Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction. The Court's conclusion in the Memorandum Opinion that laches applies to bar a TRO impacts how and when the Court goes forward in this case. It is not lost on that Court that, in the words of Plaintiff, the denial of a TRO may be tantamount to dismissal. (Doc. No. 28 at 9). Accordingly, by November 3, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to file notices regarding whether they believe a hearing is required to determine the propriety of a preliminary injunction, and regarding any thoughts they have about the procedure for addressing Plaintiff's remaining requested relief. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/28/2020. (am)
October 28, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 28, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Shanell L. Tyler admitted to this court. (am)
October 28, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanell L. Tyler on behalf of John Does 1-10, Tony C. Parker, Michael F. Perry, Priscilla Wainwright, Maggie Wilson (Tyler, Shanell)
October 26, 2020 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Will Sullivan filed by Corizon, LLC re: #28 Brief (non-appeal). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Contract Amendment, #2 Exhibit B: Sept. 10, 2020 TDOC Letter to W. Sullivan)(Parham, W. Travis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of W. Travis Parham filed by Corizon, LLC re: #28 Brief (non-appeal). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: June 12, 2020 T. Parham Letter to M. Wilson, #2 Exhibit B: July 9, 2020 T. Parham Letter to K. Bartels, #3 Exhibit C: Email Communications, #4 Exhibit D: Aug. 4, 2020 Centurion Email to State)(Parham, W. Travis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental briefing laches filed by John Does 1-10, Tony C. Parker, Michael F. Perry, Priscilla Wainwright, Maggie Wilson. (Shew, Dianna)
October 26, 2020 Filing 30 BRIEF filed by Centurion of Tennessee, LLC re #26 Order,. (Sims, W.)
October 26, 2020 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Dana Bell filed by Corizon, LLC re: #28 Brief (non-appeal). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Amendment 18, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Intent and Protest Notice, #3 Exhibit C: Pricing Comparison)(Parham, W. Travis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 28 BRIEF filed by Corizon, LLC re #26 Order,. (Parham, W. Travis)
October 26, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for W. Scott Sims, R. Mark Donnell, Jr, Michael R. O'Neill, Dianna Baker Shew admitted to this court. (am)
October 23, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Dianna Baker Shew on behalf of John Does 1-10, Tony C. Parker, Michael F. Perry, Priscilla Wainwright, Maggie Wilson (Shew, Dianna)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff and Defendants to file respective briefs regarding the propriety (or lack thereof) of the application of laches to the requested temporary restraining order and/or requested preliminary injunction by Monday, October 26, 2020, at 12:00 p.m. (Noon). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/23/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing by Corizon, LLC re #24 Reply to Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: May 7, 2020 S. Wood Letter to M. Wilson, #2 Exhibit B: July 8, 2020 K. Bartels Letter to T. Parham)(Parham, W. Travis)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Corizon, LLC. (Parham, W. Travis)
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. O'Neill on behalf of Centurion of Tennessee, LLC (O'Neill, Michael)
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Mark Donnell, Jr on behalf of Centurion of Tennessee, LLC (Donnell, R.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Centurion of Tennessee, LLC. (Sims, W.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Sims on behalf of Centurion of Tennessee, LLC (Sims, W.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS returned executed by Corizon, LLC. Centurion of Tennessee, LLC served on 10/22/2020. (Parham, W. Travis)
October 22, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Centurion of Tennessee, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Robert May, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Samantha Phillips, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Wes Landers)(Sims, W.)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing by Priscilla Wainwright (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter to Travis Parnham, #2 Attachment Corizon Submissions, #3 Attachment Other Respondants, #4 Attachment Corizon Letter)(Shew, Dianna)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Priscilla Wainwright. (Shew, Dianna)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Corizon, LLC. Maggie Wilson served on 10/20/2020. (Parham, W. Travis)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed by Corizon, LLC. Priscilla Wainwright served on 10/20/2020. (Parham, W. Travis)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Corizon, LLC. Michael F. Perry served on 10/20/2020. (Parham, W. Travis)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Corizon, LLC. Tony C. Parker served on 10/20/2020. (Parham, W. Travis)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/20/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
October 20, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for W. Travis Parham, Andrew A. Warth admitted to this court. (am)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (am)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction (the "Motion"). (Doc. No. #2 ). Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Response to the Motion by the end of the calendar day on Thursday, October 22, 2020. Plaintiff's counsel has certified that a copy of the Motion was served upon Defendants on October 19, 2020, but no counsel for Defendants has filed a notice of appearance in this action. Accordingly, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order on any subsequently identified counsel for Defendant as soon as possible by any available means. Once the Court has received Defendants' Response, it will determine whether to schedule a hearing on the Motion or whether instead it can rule promptly on the Motion based on the parties' respective filings. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/20/2020. (vh)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Centurion of Tennessee, LLC, Tony C. Parker, Michael F. Perry, Priscilla Wainwright, Maggie Wilson. (Service packets sent to attorney by regular mail.) (am)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Corizon, LLC. (am)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Evidentiary Material by Corizon, LLC. (am)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Mary Jeanne Anderson filed by Corizon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae, #2 Exhibit B - List of Cases, #3 Exhibit C - List of Documents Reviewed and Considered)(am)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION and Memorandum of Law Seeking Limited Expedited Discovery by Corizon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Requests)(am)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction filed by Corizon, LLC. (am)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction by Corizon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - TRO Proposed Order)(am)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centurion of Tennessee, LLC, John Does 1-10, Tony C. Parker, Michael F. Perry, Priscilla Wainwright, Maggie Wilson, additonal employees of the State of Tennessee operating in their official capacities (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3237529), filed by Corizon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - RFP Release 1, #3 Exhibit B - Internal Landers Communication, #4 Exhibit C - Landers-Centurion Communications, #5 Exhibit D - RFP Release 2, #6 Exhibit E - Landers TDOC Resignation Form, #7 Exhibit F - Alsup-Wilson Communications, #8 Exhibit G - June 4 2020 Letter and Corizon Response, #9 Exhibit H - Young-Wilson Communications, #10 Exhibit I - 2020-08-20 Inmate BH Contract - Centurion, #11 Exhibit J - Ethics Policy)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corizon, LLC v. Wainwright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corizon, LLC
Represented By: W. Travis Parham
Represented By: Andrew A. Warth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Wilson
Represented By: Dianna Baker Shew
Represented By: Shanell L. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Dianna Baker Shew
Represented By: Shanell L. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Perry
Represented By: Dianna Baker Shew
Represented By: Shanell L. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony C. Parker
Represented By: Dianna Baker Shew
Represented By: Shanell L. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Wainwright
Represented By: Dianna Baker Shew
Represented By: Shanell L. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: R. Mark Donnell, Jr.
Represented By: W. Scott Sims
Represented By: Michael R. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: additonal employees of the State of Tennessee operating in their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?