Jones et al v. Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP et al
Plaintiff: Bryan D. Jones and Jeffrey G. Jones
Defendant: Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP doing business as Glad Music Co. doing business as Glad Music Publishing, Round Hill Music LP doing business as Fort Knox Music, Inc., David L. Snoddy, Nancy Jones, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Dwayne D. Maddox, III, Pappy Daily Music LP and World-Wide Records, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00920
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Before this Court is an Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Doc. #57 ) filed by defendants, David L. Snoddy and World-Wide Records, Inc., IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for defendants, David L. Snoddy and World-Wide Records, Inc., to file an answer, or otherwise respond, to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is extended from December 18, 2020 to January 22, 2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/18/2020. (mg)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#57 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by David L. Snoddy, World-Wide Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Robert, Al)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Given the extensions of time granted to the various defendants to respond to the Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for January 5, 2021 is hereby RESET for 2/8/2021 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/17/2020. (kc)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: It is ordered that the deadline for Defendant Nancy Jones to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 is extended from Friday, December 18, 2020 to Friday, 1/22/2021. This extension is provided without any waiver of rights or any prejudice to Defendant Nancy Jones with respect to any motions that she may file. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/17/2020. (kc)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by Nancy Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Newsom, Patrick)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants, GLAD MUSIC PUBLISHING & RECORDING LP d/b/a GLAD MUSIC CO. and/or GLAD MUSIC PUBLISHING ("Glad Music") and PAPPY DAILY MUSIC LP ("Pappy Daily") to file a reply or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Relief #1 be extended to 1/22/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP answer due 1/22/2021; Pappy Daily Music LP answer due 1/22/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/15/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP, Pappy Daily Music LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Vlahos, Chris)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Chris L. Vlahos, Jenna Lyn Harris admitted to this court. (kc)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris L. Vlahos on behalf of Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP, Pappy Daily Music LP (Vlahos, Chris)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting re #47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Round Hill Music LP. Round Hill Music LP answer is due on 1/22/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/11/2020. (kc)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Round Hill Music LP ("Round Hill") to file a Reply or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Bryan D. Jones and Jeffrey G. Jones (collectively "Plaintiffs") Complaint #1 be extended from December 11, 2020 to Friday, 1/22/2021. This extension is provided without any waiver of rights or any prejudice to Round Hill with respect to any motions that it may file. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/11/2020. (kc)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Round Hill Music LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION TO FILING DEADLINE)(Busch, Richard)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of Service - Supplemental filed by David L. Snoddy, World-Wide Records, Inc. re #30 Notice of Appearance filed by David L. Snoddy, World-Wide Records, Inc., #31 MOTION for attorney Al J. Robert, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3263301) filed by David L. Snoddy, World-Wide Records, Inc.. (Westling, Richard)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. David L. Snoddy answer due 12/18/2020; World-Wide Records, Inc. answer due 12/18/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/8/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by David L. Snoddy, World-Wide Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Robert, Al)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #31 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Al J. Robert, Jr. is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/4/20. (vk)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tracy J. Willi is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 12/4/20. (vk) Modified on 12/4/2020 (vk).
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order LA State Bar status verified as active for Al J. Robert, Jr not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (kc)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Unopposed Motion for Extension to Filing Deadline. Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP answer due 12/15/2020. Pappy Daily Music LP answer due 12/15/2020. This extension is provided without any waiver of rights or any prejudice to Glad Music and Pappy Daily with respect to any motions they may file. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/30/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 12/1/2020 (kc).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#31 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#30 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard William Westling admitted to this court. (kc)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Patrick B. Newsom admitted to this court. (kc)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#33 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TX State Bar status verified as active for Tracy J. Willi not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (kc) Modified on 12/18/2020 (kc).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#39 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#40 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP, Pappy Daily Music LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Willi, Tracy)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for attorney Tracy J. Willi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3264661) by Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP, Pappy Daily Music LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cert of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Willi, Tracy)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 is reset for 1/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 873. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/25/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #1 . Nancy Jones answer due 12/18/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/25/2020. (vh)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by Dwayne D. Maddox, III, David L. Snoddy, World-Wide Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Witness List for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by Nancy Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Newsom, Patrick)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B. Newsom on behalf of Nancy Jones (Newsom, Patrick)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Service Regarding Orders on Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Second Supplemental filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones re #13 Memorandum in Support filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones, #5 Notice of Case Management Conference, #12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones, #19 Temporary Restraining Order,,, Terminate Motions,, #20 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #14 Declaration, filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones, #18 Declaration, filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones, #16 Declaration filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones, #15 Declaration filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for attorney Al J. Robert, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3263301) by David L. Snoddy, World-Wide Records, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard William Westling on behalf of David L. Snoddy, World-Wide Records, Inc. (Westling, Richard)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Service Regarding Orders on Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones re #19 Temporary Restraining Order,,, Terminate Motions,, #20 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #28 Order, #18 Declaration, filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that all briefs in opposition to the plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction shall be filed by 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday, November 25, 2020. By the same deadline, all parties shall file a list of witnesses whom they will be calling to testify at the hearing scheduled for November 30, 2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/23/2020. (ds)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Round Hill Music LP answer due 12/11/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/19/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Round Hill Music LP ("Round Hill") to file a Reply or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Bryan D. Jones and Jeffrey G. Jones (collectively "Plaintiffs") Complaint (Dkt. No. 1) be extended from 11/20/2020 to Friday, 12/11/2020. This extension is provided without any waiver of rights or any prejudice to Round Hill with respect to any motions that it may file. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/19/2020. (kc)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Robb S. Harvey admitted to this court. (kc)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Round Hill Music LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION TO FILING DEADLINE)(Busch, Richard)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Robb S. Harvey on behalf of BMG Rights Management (US) LLC (Harvey, Robb)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS returned executed by Jeffrey G. Jones, Bryan D. Jones. Pappy Daily Music LP served on 11/5/2020. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS returned executed by Jeffrey G. Jones, Bryan D. Jones. Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP served on 11/5/2020. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#18 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Defendants on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO FILER re DE#21 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all defendants on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones re #13 Memorandum in Support filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones, #12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones, #19 Temporary Restraining Order,,, Terminate Motions,, #20 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #14 Declaration, filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones, #16 Declaration filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones, #15 Declaration filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on the plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction shall be held on Monday, 11/30/2020 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall give notice of this hearing as soon as possible, by all available means, to the defendants and/or their counsel. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/16/2020. (kc)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bryan D. Jones and Jeffrey G. Jones. Defendants Snoddy, Maddox, and World-Wide are hereby restrained from selling, transferring, conveying, assigning, distributing, destroying, disposing of, or otherwise inhibiting the preservation of the Masters and the GJ Sings Masters, as defined in Paragraphs 37 and 40, respectively, of Plaintiff's Complaint #1 . Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/16/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 11/16/2020 (kc). Modified on 11/18/2020 (kc).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Ramona P. DeSalvo-Supplemental filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones re: #13 Memorandum in Support, #14 Declaration, #12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Fax Confirmation)(DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey G. Jones, Bryan D. Jones. Dwayne D. Maddox, III waiver sent on 10/30/2020. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Bryan D. Jones filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones re: #13 Memorandum in Support, #12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Will)(DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jeffery G. Jones filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones re: #13 Memorandum in Support, #12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Ramona P. DeSalvo filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones re: #12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #13 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Fed Ex Receipt, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Case Law Snoddy v.Maddox, #3 Exhibit Ex. C News Article, #4 Exhibit Ex. D Doc 413 Order, #5 Exhibit Ex. E Snoddy Resp. Mot. Dismiss)(DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones . (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bryan D. Jones, Jeffrey G. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(DeSalvo, Ramona) Modified text on 11/19/2020 (hb).
November 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Bryan D. Jones. World-Wide Records, Inc. served on 11/9/2020. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Bryan D. Jones. David L. Snoddy served on 11/9/2020. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Dwayne D. Maddox, III. (vh)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Jeffrey G. Jones, Bryan D. Jones. Nancy Jones served on 11/6/2020. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Jeffrey G. Jones, Bryan D. Jones. Round Hill Music LP served on 10/30/2020. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Jeffrey G. Jones, Bryan D. Jones. BMG Rights Management (US) LLC served on 11/2/2020. (DeSalvo, Ramona)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 04:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (vh)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons issued as to BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP, Nancy Jones, Dwayne D. Maddox, III, Pappy Daily Music LP, Round Hill Music LP, David L. Snoddy, and World-Wide Records, Inc. (service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (vh)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Ramona P. DeSalvo admitted to this court. (vh)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP, Nancy Jones, Dwayne D. Maddox, III, Pappy Daily Music LP, Round Hill Music LP, David L. Snoddy, and World-Wide Records, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3243406), filed by Jeffrey G. Jones and Bryan D. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Am. Prop. Settlement_Redacted, #2 Exhibit B- Judgement of Divorce, #3 Exhibit C- Docket, #4 Exhibit C-1-Release, #5 Exhibit D- Death Certificate, #6 Exhibit E-Will, #7 Exhibit F- Notice of Termination, #8 Exhibit F-1-Notice of Termination, #9 Exhibit F-2-Notice of Termination, #10 Exhibit F-3- Notice of Termination, #11 Exhibit F-4-Notice of Termination, #12 Exhibit F-5-Notice of Termination, #13 Exhibit G-Inventory, #14 Exhibit H-Complaint, #15 Exhibit I-Doc. 411-1, Exhibits, #16 Exhibit J- Doc. 397 Order, #17 Exhibit J-1- Doc. 244, valuation, #18 Exhibit K- Doc. 343, Order, #19 Exhibit L- Doc. 426, Order, #20 Exhibit M- Doc. 428, Clerk's Report, #21 Exhibit N- Snoddy v. Maddox Judgement, #22 Exhibit N-1-Order, #23 Exhibit O- Feb. 23, 2018 Resp. to Mot. Dismiss, #24 Exhibit P-Doc. 411, Mot, #25 Exhibit Q- Copyright Record, #26 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glad Music Publishing & Recording LP doing business as Glad Music Co. doing business as Glad Music Publishing
Represented By: Tracy J. Willi
Represented By: Chris L. Vlahos
Represented By: Jenna Lyn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Round Hill Music LP doing business as Fort Knox Music, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S. Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Snoddy
Represented By: Richard William Westling
Represented By: Al J. Robert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Jones
Represented By: Patrick B. Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMG Rights Management (US) LLC
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne D. Maddox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pappy Daily Music LP
Represented By: Tracy J. Willi
Represented By: Chris L. Vlahos
Represented By: Jenna Lyn Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World-Wide Records, Inc.
Represented By: Richard William Westling
Represented By: Al J. Robert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan D. Jones
Represented By: Ramona P. DeSalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey G. Jones
Represented By: Ramona P. DeSalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?